VA SB84 | 2008 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 26 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-28 - House: Tabled in Transportation by voice vote

Summary

Special license plates; U.S. Air Force retirees. Authorizes the issuance of special license plates for retired members of the United States Air Force.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

License plates, special; issuance to U.S. Air Force retirees.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2008-02-28 House: Tabled in Transportation by voice vote
2008-02-13 House: Referred to Committee on Transportation
2008-02-13 House: Read first time
2008-02-13 House: Placed on Calendar
2008-02-12 Senate: Communicated to House
2008-02-12 Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2008-02-12 Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2008-02-12 Senate: Read second time and engrossed
2008-02-11 Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2008-02-07 Senate: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N)
2007-12-26 Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation
2007-12-26 Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 087036216

Subjects


Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback