VA SB838 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-10 - Failed to report (defeated) in Counties, Cities and Towns (10-Y 10-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-10 - Failed to report (defeated) in Counties, Cities and Towns (10-Y 10-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Vacant buildings; registration. Permits any city and certain towns to require, by ordinance, the owner of any building that has been vacant for at least 12 months and (i) which meets the definition of "derelict building", (ii) which meet the definition of "criminal blight", or (iii) in which a locality has determined a person is living without the authority of the owner or owners to register such building annually. Under current law, any city and certain towns are permitted to require the owner of any building that has been vacant for at least 12 months and meets the definition of "derelict building" in relevant law to register such building annually. Vacant buildings; registration. Permits any city and certain towns to require, by ordinance, the owner of any building that has been vacant for at least 12 months and (i) which meets the definition of "derelict building", (ii) which meet the definition of "criminal blight", or (iii) in which a locality has determined a person is living without the authority of the owner or owners to register such building annually. Under current law, any city and certain towns are permitted to require the owner of any building that has been vacant for at least 12 months and meets the definition of "derelict building" in relevant law to register such building annually.
Title
Vacant building; registration.
Sponsors
Sen. Mamie Locke [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-10 - House - House: Failed to report (defeated) in Counties, Cities and Towns (10-Y 10-N) (Y: 10 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-10 | House | Failed to report (defeated) in Counties, Cities and Towns (10-Y 10-N) |
2023-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (9-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-08 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2023-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2023-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB838S1 |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 23105831D-S1 |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 23105831D-S1 |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Local Government with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-12-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2022-12-27 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23102458D |