VA SB838 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Community College System; Temporary Assistance for Needy Families Scholarship Pilot Program. Directs the Virginia Community College System (VCCS) to establish a three-year Temporary Assistance for Needy Families (TANF) Scholarship Pilot Program (the Program) for the purpose of providing access to postsecondary educational opportunities to students living in poverty. The Program would provide scholarships to select community colleges in the amount of $4,000 per year, to be applied toward the costs of tuition and books, to 200 selected students who meet TANF eligibility requirements. The Program would be funded with federal TANF block grant funds. The bill directs VCCS to (i) enter into a memorandum of understanding with the State Department of Social Services establishing the parameters of the Program and the method for selecting students to participate; (ii) monitor, record, and analyze the outcomes of all participants; and (iii) report to the Governor and the General Assembly no later than December 1 of each year regarding the effectiveness of and other information about the Program. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a general appropriation act.
Title
Temporary Assistance for Needy Families Scholarship Pilot Program; DSS to establish and administer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Education (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2017-02-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-02-20 | House | Reported from Education (19-Y 3-N) |
2017-02-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-02-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) |
2017-02-10 | House | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2017-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB838S2 |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 17104977D-S2 |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Committee substitute rejected 17104289D-S1 |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17104977D-S2 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17104289D-S1 |
2016-11-15 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2016-11-15 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100683D |
Subjects
Community Colleges
Higher Education
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Uncodified Legislation
Welfare (Social Services)
Higher Education
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Uncodified Legislation
Welfare (Social Services)