VA SB837 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-08 - Letter sent to the Department of Corrections
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Corrections Private Management Act; name change; private management prohibited. Removes the authority of the Director of the Department of Corrections pursuant to the Corrections Private Management Act (the Act) to enter into contracts with prison contractors for the operation of prison facilities, including management, custody of inmates, and provision of security. The bill does not affect the Director's authority pursuant to the Act, renamed by the bill the Corrections Private Services Act, to enter into private contracts for other correctional services, including those related to food service, medical care, transportation, sanitation, information systems, education and training programs, recreational or religious activities, financing, construction, or maintenance. The bill has a delayed effective date of July 1, 2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Corrections Private Management Act; name change, private management prohibited.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-08SenateLetter sent to the Department of Corrections
2020-01-24SenatePassed by indefinitely in Rehabilitation and Social Services with letter (11-Y 4-N)
2020-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2020-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102321D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221837(n/a)See Bill Text
223703(n/a)See Bill Text
5311(n/a)See Bill Text
531261(n/a)See Bill Text
531262(n/a)See Bill Text
531263(n/a)See Bill Text
531264(n/a)See Bill Text
531265(n/a)See Bill Text
531266(n/a)See Bill Text
53131.1(n/a)See Bill Text
801195.10(n/a)See Bill Text
801690(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback