VA SB836 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0589)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0589)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services; Problem Gambling Treatment and Support Advisory Committee established. Directs the Commissioner of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services to establish and maintain the Problem Gambling Treatment and Support Advisory Committee to enable collaboration among prevention and treatment providers and operators of legal gaming in the Commonwealth on efforts to reduce the negative effects of problem gambling.
Title
Problem Gambling Treatment and Support Advisory Committee; established.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0589) | |
2023-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 589 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB836ER) |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2023-02-17 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-17 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-17 | House | Read third time |
2023-02-16 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-14 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2023-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Assigned GL&T sub: Gaming |
2022-12-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2022-12-27 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23103256D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1465 (Same As) 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0588)
HB1465 (Same As) 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0588)
HB1465 (Same As) 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0588)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | 2 | 304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4006 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 369 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |