VA SB836 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0302)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0302)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Naloxone; possession and administration; employee or person acting on behalf of a public place. Provides that an employee or other person acting on behalf of a public place who has completed a training program on the administration of naloxone or other opioid antagonist may possess and administer naloxone or other opioid antagonist, other than naloxone in an injectable formulation with a hypodermic needle or syringe, in accordance with protocols developed by the Board of Pharmacy in consultation with the Board of Medicine and the Department of Health. The bill defines "public place" as any enclosed area that is used or held out for use by the public, whether owned or operated by a public or private interest.
Title
Naloxone; possession and administration, employee or person acting on behalf of a public place.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0302) | |
2020-03-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 302 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB836ER) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-21 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-21 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-21 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-18 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Professions |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104831D |