VA SB835 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-22 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-22 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibited sales and loans to juveniles; definition of sexual conduct. Clarifies the definition of "sexual conduct" so that it is neutral regarding sexual orientation for the purposes of crimes related to prohibited sales and loans to juveniles.
Title
Juveniles; prohibited sales and loans, clarifies definition of sexual conduct.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 4-N) (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (25-Y 12-N) (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (25-Y 12-N) (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-22 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2023-02-13 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 4-N) |
2023-02-10 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2023-02-09 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2023-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (25-Y 12-N) |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB835S1 |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 23104579D-S1 |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Read second time |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-16 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 23104579D-S1 |
2023-01-16 | Senate | Incorporates SB837 (Dunnavant) |
2023-01-16 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 6-N) |
2022-12-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2022-12-24 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23100240D |
Same As/Similar To
SB837 (Similar To) 2023-01-16 - Incorporated by Judiciary
SB837 (Similar To) 2023-01-16 - Incorporated by Judiciary
SB837 (Similar To) 2023-01-16 - Incorporated by Judiciary