VA SB833 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1177)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1177)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; tasting licenses. Increases from four to 12 the number of tasting licenses that may be issued to a person per year.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; limitation of tasting licenses.
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (94-Y 5-N 1-A) (Y: 94 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1177) | |
2020-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1177 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB833ER) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-25 | House | VOTE: Passage (94-Y 5-N 1-A) |
2020-02-25 | House | Passed House (94-Y 5-N 1-A) |
2020-02-25 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-24 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-20 | House | Reported from General Laws (19-Y 2-N) |
2020-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-14 | House | Assigned GL sub: ABC/Gaming |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB833S1 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20107021D-S1 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20107021D-S1 |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Assigned Rehab sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102452D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
4 | 1 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 206 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 231 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 233 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |