VA SB830 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0237)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0237)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Pharmacy technicians and pharmacy technician trainees; registration. Amends eligibility criteria for registration as a pharmacy technician to include a requirement that the individual has (i) successfully completed or was enrolled in a Board of Pharmacy-approved pharmacy technician training program or (ii) passed a national certification examination required by the Board of Pharmacy but did not complete a Board-approved pharmacy technician training program. The bill also directs the Board to establish requirements for the issuance of a registration as a pharmacy technician to a person who (a) has previously practiced as a pharmacy technician in another U.S. jurisdiction and (b) has passed a national certification examination required by the Board. The bill defines "pharmacy technician trainee" and sets out requirements for registration as a pharmacy technician trainee. The bill also directs the Board to convene a workgroup composed of stakeholders deemed appropriate by the Board to develop recommendations related to the addition of duties that a pharmacy technician registered by the Board may perform.
Title
Pharmacy technicians and pharmacy technician trainees; registration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0237) | |
2020-03-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 237 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB830ER) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-21 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-21 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-21 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-18 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB830S1 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20106221D-S1 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20106221D-S1 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Professions |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20105048D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1304 (Same As) 2020-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0102)