VA SB830 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-05 - Incorporated by General Laws and Technology
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-05 - Incorporated by General Laws and Technology
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Open Data Initiative Act. Creates the Virginia Open Data Initiative Act to increase public awareness of and access to the data created by and available from state agencies. The bill provides for appointment by the Governor of a Chief Data Officer to oversee the establishment of procedures, standards, and best practices regarding the appropriate access and presentation of open data and datasets by each agency. The Chief Data Officer shall develop a dataset format standard to be used by all agencies when providing their datasets to the Chief Data Officer or when making their data available on their own websites and shall ensure that, under the standard, the datasets are accessible in a nonproprietary, machine-readable format that is compliant with state and federal law. The bill also provides for the Chief Data Officer to submit by December 31, 2019, a written report to the Governor and the General Assembly consisting of (i) the progress made on the implementation of the provisions of the bill, (ii) the effectiveness in providing open data and datasets to the public and among agencies, and (iii) the feasibility of expanding the open data initiative to the legislative and judicial branches of government. This bill was incorporated into SB 580.
Title
Virginia Open Data Initiative Act; created, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Incorporated by General Laws and Technology (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-05 | Senate | Incorporated by General Laws and Technology |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Assigned GL&T sub: #2 |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 18102965D |