VA SB824 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB824
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; distiller licenses; Internet orders and shipments. Allows the Virginia Alcoholic Beverage Control Authority to include provisions in its agency agreements with licensed distillers operating government stores that allow such distillers to sell spirits and low alcohol beverage coolers through Internet orders and ship such orders directly to consumers and licensees within the Commonwealth. Alcoholic beverage control; distiller licenses; Internet orders and shipments. Allows the Virginia Alcoholic Beverage Control Authority to include provisions in its agency agreements with licensed distillers operating government stores that allow such distillers to sell spirits and low alcohol beverage coolers through Internet orders and ship such orders directly to consumers and licensees within the Commonwealth.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; distiller licenses, Internet orders and shipments.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ruff [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-04 | House | Left in General Laws |
2020-02-20 | House | Continued to 2021 in General Laws by voice vote |
2020-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote |
2020-02-14 | House | Assigned GL sub: ABC/Gaming |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB824S1 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20106849D-S1 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20106849D-S1 |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Assigned Rehab sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102485D |
Same As/Similar To
SB824 (Carry Over) 2020-02-20 - Continued to 2021 in General Laws by voice vote