VA SB824 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-07 - Passed by indefinitely in Finance (13-Y 3-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-07 - Passed by indefinitely in Finance (13-Y 3-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Public institutions of higher education; tuition and fee increases; public comment. Prohibits the governing board of each public institution of higher education from approving an increase in undergraduate tuition or mandatory fees without providing students and the public an opportunity to provide public comment at a board meeting at least 30 days prior to any vote on such an increase.
Title
Higher educational institutions, public; tuition and fee increases, notice to students and public.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Finance (13-Y 3-N) (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-07 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Finance (13-Y 3-N) |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18106011D-S1 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 1-N) |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 18104883D |