VA SB823 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0848)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Wireless support structures; public rights-of-way use fees. Establishes an annual wireless support structure public rights-of-way use fee to be charged to wireless services providers and wireless infrastructure providers in connection with a permit for occupation and use of the public rights-of-way under the jurisdiction of the Department of Transportation (VDOT) for the construction of new wireless support structures. The amount of the use fee is (i) $1,000 for any wireless support structure at or below 50 feet in height; (ii) $3,000 for any wireless support structure above 50 feet and at or below 120 feet in height; (iii) $5,000 for any wireless support structure above 120 feet in height; and (iv) $1 per square foot for any other equipment, shelter, or associated facilities constructed on the ground. The measure provides that the use fee amounts shall be adjusted every five years on the basis of inflation. The measure also provides that VDOT may elect to continue enforcing any existing agreement, contract, license, easement, or permit allowing the use of the public rights-of-way by a wireless services provider or wireless infrastructure provider existing prior to July 1, 2018. This bill is identical to HB 1427.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wireless support structures; public rights-of-way use fees established.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 3-N 1-A) (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (35-Y 0-N 4-A) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (67-Y 29-N 2-A) (Y: 67 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (19-Y 18-N 3-A) (Y: 19 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (12-Y 3-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0848)
2018-04-18HouseEnacted, Chapter 848 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-04-18HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2018-04-18SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2018-04-18SenateReenrolled bill text (SB823ER2)
2018-04-18SenateReenrolled
2018-04-18 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2018-04-18HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 3-N 1-A)
2018-04-18HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (94-Y 3-N 1-A)
2018-04-18SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (35-Y 0-N 4-A)
2018-04-09SenateGovernor's recommendation received by Senate
2018-03-05 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-05SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 5, 2018
2018-03-02SenateSigned by President
2018-02-27HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-02-27SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB823ER)
2018-02-27SenateEnrolled
2018-02-23HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (67-Y 29-N 2-A)
2018-02-23HousePassed House (67-Y 29-N 2-A)
2018-02-23HouseRead third time
2018-02-22HouseRead second time
2018-02-20HouseReported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N)
2018-02-19HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2018-02-19HouseRead first time
2018-02-19HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-13SenatePassed Senate (19-Y 18-N 3-A)
2018-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-13SenateRead second time and engrossed
2018-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-08SenateReported from Finance (12-Y 3-N 1-A)
2018-02-05SenateRereferred to Finance
2018-02-05SenateReported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 0-N 2-A)
2018-01-15SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2018-01-15SenatePresented and ordered printed 18104616D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+SB823
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB823+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB823ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB823ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0848+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S02V0083+SB0823
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S05V0220+SB0823
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0410SB0823+SB0823
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0486SB0823+SB0823
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0492SB0823+SB0823
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H14V0183+SB0823
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1013+SB0823
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1238SB0823+SB0823
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1674+SB0823

Bill Comments

feedback