VA SB816 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Grand larceny; threshold. Increases from $200 to $500 the threshold amount of money taken or value of goods or chattel taken at which the crime rises from petit larceny to grand larceny. This bill incorporates SB923.
Title
Grand larceny & certain property crimes; increases threshold amount of money taken, etc., to $1,000.
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Surovell [D] | Sen. John Petersen [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Dance [D] | Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] |
Sen. Jennifer McClellan [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (28-Y 12-N) (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 8-N) (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 8-N) (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2017-02-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely by voice vote |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-31 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (28-Y 12-N) |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 8-N) |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB816S1 |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 17104654D-S1 |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Incorporates SB923 (Petersen) |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17104654D-S1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 2-N) |
2016-11-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-11-02 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100605D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 108.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 145.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 150 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 152.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 162 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 181 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 181.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 182 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 186 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 186.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 187.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 188 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 195 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 195.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 197 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 23 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 340.37 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 80 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 81 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 95 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 97 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 289 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 290 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 386.16 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
29 | 1 | 553 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |