VA SB812 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0805)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Board for Asbestos, Lead, and Home Inspectors; home inspections; required statement related to the presence of yellow shaded corrugated stainless steel tubing. Provides that whenever a home inspector observes the presence of any shade of yellow shaded corrugated stainless steel tubing during an inspection of a home built prior to the adoption of the construction code effective in 2008, his observation must be included in the inspection report along with the following statement: "Manufacturers believe that this product is safer if properly bonded and grounded as required by the manufacturer's installation instructions. Proper bonding and grounding of the product should be determined by a contractor licensed to perform the work in the Commonwealth of Virginia."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Asbestos, Lead, and Home Inspectors, Board for; home inspections, required statement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 3-N) (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (12-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-05 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0805)
2017-04-05HouseEnacted, Chapter 805 (effective 7/1/17)
2017-04-05HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2017-04-05SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2017-04-05SenateReenrolled bill text (SB812ER2)
2017-04-05SenateReenrolled
2017-04-05 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2017-04-05HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
2017-04-05HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 0-N)
2017-04-05SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
2017-03-20SenateGovernor's recommendation received by Senate
2017-02-28 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
2017-02-28SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/28/17
2017-02-24HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-02-24SenateSigned by President
2017-02-24SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB812ER)
2017-02-24SenateEnrolled
2017-02-21HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2017-02-21HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2017-02-21HouseRead third time
2017-02-20HouseRead second time
2017-02-16HouseReported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
2017-02-14HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
2017-02-06HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4
2017-01-31HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2017-01-31HouseRead first time
2017-01-31HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-01-27SenateRead third time and passed Senate (36-Y 3-N)
2017-01-26SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB812S1
2017-01-26SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 17104489D-S1
2017-01-26SenateReading of substitute waived
2017-01-26SenateRead second time
2017-01-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2017-01-23SenateCommittee substitute printed 17104489D-S1
2017-01-23SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (12-Y 1-N 1-A)
2016-11-01SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2016-11-01SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100246D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
541517.2:1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+SB812
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB812+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB812S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB812ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB812ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+CHAP0805+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S12V0031+SB0812
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0122SB0812+SB0812
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0150SB0812+SB0812
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H1104V0085+SB0812
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H11V0231+SB0812
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2510+SB0812
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV1081SB0812+SB0812
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2903+SB0812

Bill Comments

feedback