VA SB812 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-06 - Incorporated by Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-06 - Incorporated by Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Lobbyist disclosure; definition of executive action; procurement transactions. Includes procurement transactions under the definition of "executive action." "Procurement transaction" is defined as all functions that pertain to obtaining goods, services, or construction on behalf of an executive agency, including description of requirements, selection and solicitation of sources, preparation and award of contract, and all phases of contract administration.
Title
Lobbyist disclosure; definition of executive action, procurement transactions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Incorporated by Rules (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-06 | Senate | Incorporated by Rules |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Assigned Rules sub: Ethics and Conflict of Interest |
2015-01-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2015-01-02 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101907D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1424 (Similar To) 2015-04-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0777)