VA SB811 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB811
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Sentencing in a criminal case; jury trial. Provides that in a criminal case the court shall ascertain the extent of the punishment, unless the accused has requested that the jury ascertain punishment or was found guilty of capital murder. Sentencing in a criminal case; jury trial. Provides that in a criminal case the court shall ascertain the extent of the punishment, unless the accused has requested that the jury ascertain punishment or was found guilty of capital murder.
Title
Sentencing in a criminal case; procedure for trial by jury, ascertainment of punishment, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-04 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2020-03-02 | House | Continued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2020-02-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote |
2020-02-18 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-02-14 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB811S1 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20107869D-S1 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20107869D-S1 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (10-Y 5-N) |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Assigned Judiciary sub: Criminal Law |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103829D |
Same As/Similar To
SB811 (Carry Over) 2020-03-02 - Continued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 295.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 295.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |