VA SB810 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Continued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Discretionary sentencing guidelines worksheets; use by juries. Requires that the jury be given the applicable discretionary sentencing guidelines worksheets during a sentencing proceeding and that the court instruct the jury that the sentencing guidelines worksheets are discretionary and not binding on the jury. The bill requires sentencing guidelines worksheets to be kept confidential by the jurors and filed under seal by the court.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Discretionary sentencing guidelines worksheets; use by juries.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-02HouseContinued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
2020-02-28HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N)
2020-02-18HouseAssigned Courts sub: Criminal
2020-02-14HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2020-02-14HouseRead first time
2020-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (22-Y 18-N)
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateRead second time and engrossed
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-10SenateReported from Judiciary (8-Y 6-N)
2020-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103833D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192295.1(n/a)See Bill Text
192298.01(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback