VA SB81 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 26 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-11-26 - Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Minimum wage. Increases the minimum wage from its current federally mandated level of $7.25 per hour to $9.75 per hour, effective July 1, 2020; to $10.75 per hour, effective July 1, 2021; to $11.75 per hour, effective July 1, 2022; to $12.75 per hour, effective July 1, 2023; to $14 per hour, effective July 1, 2024; and to $15 per hour, effective July 1, 2025, unless a higher minimum wage is required by the federal Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA). The measure also provides that the Virginia minimum wage applies to persons whose employment is covered by the FLSA and to public employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Minimum wage; increases to $9.75 per hour, effective July 1, 2020, etc.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-26SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-11-26SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100925D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
40128.10(n/a)See Bill Text
40128.9(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback