VA SB809 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-03 - Incorporated by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-03 - Incorporated by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Application of parole statutes. Repeals the abolition of parole. The bill also provides that the Virginia Parole Board shall establish procedures for consideration of parole for persons who were previously ineligible for parole, because parole was abolished, to allow for an extension of time for reasonable cause.
Title
Parole; application of statutes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Incorporated by Judiciary (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Rehabilitation and Social Services (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Rehabilitation and Social Services (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | Incorporated by Judiciary |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Assigned Judiciary sub: Criminal Law |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Rereferred from Rehabilitation and Social Services (12-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103823D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
53 | 1 | 165.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 165.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |