VA SB808 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB808

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Expungement of police and court records; misdemeanor and felony convictions. Allows a person convicted of a criminal offense to file a petition requesting expungement of the police and court records relating to the conviction if such person (i) has been free from any term of incarceration, probation, and postrelease supervision imposed as a result of such conviction for (a) at least eight years for a misdemeanor offense or (b) at least 12 years for a felony offense; (ii) has no subsequent convictions other than traffic infractions; and (iii) has no pending criminal proceeding. Expungement of police and court records; misdemeanor and felony convictions. Allows a person convicted of a criminal offense to file a petition requesting expungement of the police and court records relating to the conviction if such person (i) has been free from any term of incarceration, probation, and postrelease supervision imposed as a result of such conviction for (a) at least eight years for a misdemeanor offense or (b) at least 12 years for a felony offense; (ii) has no subsequent convictions other than traffic infractions; and (iii) has no pending criminal proceeding.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Police and court records; expungement of records, misdemeanor and felony convictions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-04SenateLeft in Judiciary
2020-01-29SenateContinued to 2021 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
2020-01-20SenateAssigned Judiciary sub: Criminal Law
2020-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103819D

Same As/Similar To

SB808 (Carry Over) 2020-01-29 - Continued to 2021 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192392.1(n/a)See Bill Text
192392.2(n/a)See Bill Text
192392.4(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback