VA SB802 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0685)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0685)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Licensure of professional counselors; Counseling Compact. Authorizes Virginia to become a signatory to the Counseling Compact. The Compact permits eligible licensed professional counselors to practice in Compact member states, provided that they are licensed in at least one member state. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2024, and directs the Board of Counseling to adopt emergency regulations to implement the provisions of the bill.
Title
Counseling Compact; licensure of professional counselors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 5-N) (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 1-N) (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 5-N) (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 1-N) (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0685) | |
2023-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 685 (effective 1/1/24) | |
2023-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 13, 2023 |
2023-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB802ER) |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2023-02-22 | House | VOTE: Passage (97-Y 1-N) |
2023-02-22 | House | Passed House (97-Y 1-N) |
2023-02-22 | House | Read third time |
2023-02-21 | House | Passed by for the day |
2023-02-20 | House | Passed by for the day |
2023-02-17 | House | Passed by for the day |
2023-02-16 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-14 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2023-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 5-N) |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 1-N) |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-12-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2022-12-05 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23100851D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1433 (Same As) 2023-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0684)