VA SB801 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0427)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Financing of clean energy programs; development of underwriting guidelines. Expands the requirements of a local ordinance authorizing contracts to provide loans for clean energy improvements. The bill adds water efficiency improvements to the list of improvements for which loans may be offered, allows a locality to contract with a third party to administer the loan program, and requires a locality to identify any administrative fee it intends to impose on participants and sets parameters for the imposition of that fee. The bill also details the priority, enforceability, and other characteristics of the lien, now called a voluntary special assessment lien, that a locality is permitted to place against the property where the clean energy systems are installed. Finally, the bill directs the Department of Mines, Minerals and Energy (DMME) to develop underwriting guidelines for local loans made to finance clean energy improvements. The bill requires DMME to finalize the guidelines by December 1, 2015, incorporating input from certain groups representing real estate, energy efficiency, banking, and other interests or industries and evaluating certain specific criteria. This bill is a recommendation of the Virginia Housing Commission and is identical to

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clean energy; financing programs, development of underwriting guidelines.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 4-N 1-A) (Y: 96 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-23 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0427)
2015-03-23 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 427 (effective 7/1/15)
2015-02-26 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
2015-02-26SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/26/15
2015-02-26SenateSigned by President
2015-02-24HouseSigned by Speaker
2015-02-24SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB801ER)
2015-02-24SenateEnrolled
2015-02-19SenateTitle replaced 15105080D-H1
2015-02-19SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2015-02-17HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 4-N 1-A)
2015-02-17HousePassed House with substitute (94-Y 4-N 1-A)
2015-02-17HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB801H1
2015-02-17HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 15105080D-H1
2015-02-17HouseRead third time
2015-02-16HouseRead second time
2015-02-13HouseCommittee substitute printed 15105080D-H1
2015-02-13HouseReported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (20-Y 1-N)
2015-02-06HouseReferred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
2015-02-06HouseRead first time
2015-02-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2015-02-02SenatePassed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2015-02-02SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
2015-02-02SenateRead third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
2015-01-30SenateRead second time and engrossed
2015-01-29SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2015-01-27SenateReported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
2015-01-02SenateReferred to Committee on Local Government
2015-01-02SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100988D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
152958.3(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+SB801
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+SB801+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+SB801H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+SB801ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+CHAP0427+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+S07V0019+SB0801
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+SV0160SB0801+SB0801
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+SV0182SB0801+SB0801
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+SV0184SB0801+SB0801
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+SV0185SB0801+SB0801
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+H07V0062+SB0801
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+HV2390+SB0801
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+SV0602SB0801+SB0801

Bill Comments

feedback