VA SB801 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0550)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Bonds; capital projects at institutions of higher learning. Authorizes the Treasury Board to issue bonds pursuant to Article X, Section 9 (c) of the Constitution of Virginia in an amount up to $64,579,000 plus financing costs to finance revenue-producing capital projects at Virginia Commonwealth University and Virginia State University. The bill declares that an emergency exists and that the bill is effective upon passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher Educational Institutions Bond Act of 2011; created.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-25 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0550)
2011-03-25 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 550 (effective 3/25/11)
2011-03-06 Senate: Signed by President
2011-03-03 House: Signed by Speaker
2011-03-03 Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB801ER)
2011-03-03 Senate: Enrolled
2011-02-23 House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2011-02-23 House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2011-02-23 House: Passed by temporarily
2011-02-23 House: Read third time
2011-02-22 House: Read second time
2011-02-18 House: Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N)
2011-02-17 House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2011-02-15 House: Assigned App. sub: Capital Outlay
2011-02-09 House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations
2011-02-09 House: Read first time
2011-02-09 House: Placed on Calendar
2011-02-07 Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2011-02-07 Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2011-02-07 Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2011-02-04 Senate: Read second time and engrossed
2011-02-03 Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2011-02-02 Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N)
2010-12-17 Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance
2010-12-17 Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/12/11 11102219D

Subjects


Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+SB801
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+SB801+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+SB801ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+CHAP0550+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+S05V0165+SB0801
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+SV0214SB0801+SB0801
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+SV0246SB0801+SB0801
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+SV0253SB0801+SB0801
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+SV0254SB0801+SB0801
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+H0201V0007+SB0801
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+H02V0109+SB0801
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+HV1291+SB0801

Bill Comments

feedback