VA SB80 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

State School Health Advisory Board. Establishes the State School Health Advisory Board in the executive branch to advise the General Assembly and the Governor on pending or proposed legislation concerning the role of employees in public elementary or secondary schools in providing health care services at such schools and to provide guidance on any associated training requirements. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a general appropriation act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State School Health Advisory Board; established, report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendments (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-06HouseLeft in Appropriations
2018-02-28HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N)
2018-02-22HouseAssigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education
2018-02-19HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2018-02-19HouseRead first time
2018-02-19HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-13SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-13SenatePrinted as engrossed 18100382D-E
2018-02-13SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB80E
2018-02-13SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2018-02-13SenateReading of amendments waived
2018-02-13SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2018-02-13SenateReading of amendment waived
2018-02-13SenateRead second time
2018-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-12SenateReported from Finance with amendments (16-Y 0-N)
2018-02-09SenateRereferred to Finance
2018-02-09SenateReported from Rules with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
2017-12-06SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2017-12-06SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100382D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
222101(n/a)See Bill Text
221275.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback