VA SB80 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 26 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-01-28 - Senate: Incorporated by Courts of Justice (SB246-Howell) (13-Y 0-N)
Status: Introduced on December 26 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-01-28 - Senate: Incorporated by Courts of Justice (SB246-Howell) (13-Y 0-N)
Summary
Involuntary commitment; electronic examination by independent examiner. Requires that all examinations be conducted in person unless the examination cannot be completed within 48 hours of the issuance of the temporary detention order, in which case the examination may be made via electronic means. This bill has been incorporated into
Title
Involuntary commitment; electronic examination by independent examiner.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-01-28 | Senate: Incorporated by Courts of Justice (SB246-Howell) (13-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-21 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Special on Proposed Mental Health Legislation | |
2007-12-26 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2007-12-26 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 086300216 |
Same As/Similar To
SB246 (Similar To) 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0788)
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB80 |