VA SB796 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Expungement of certain charges and convictions. Allows a person to petition for expungement of convictions and deferred disposition dismissals for marijuana possession, underage alcohol possession, and using a false ID to obtain alcohol when the offense occurred prior to the person's twenty-first birthday, all court costs, fines, and restitution have been paid, and five years have elapsed since the date of completion of all terms of sentencing and probation.
Title
Police and court records; expungement of certain charges and convictions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2017-02-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-30 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 0-N) |
2016-10-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-10-04 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100310D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 392.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 392.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |