VA SB790 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-11-30 - Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Employment Commission; development of a plan for a paid family-medical leave program. Requires the Virginia Employment Commission (VEC), in consultation with a work group composed of representatives of interested groups, to develop a plan for a program for private employers in the Commonwealth with 50 or more salaried employees to offer paid family-medical leave for their employees. The measure requires the VEC to submit its plan to the General Assembly by December 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Employment Commission; development of a plan for a paid family-medical leave program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2019 in Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-30SenateLeft in Finance
2018-02-12SenateContinued to 2019 in Finance (16-Y 0-N)
2018-02-12SenateRereferred to Finance
2018-02-12SenateRereferred from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
2018-02-08SenateRereferred to Commerce and Labor
2018-02-08SenateRereferred from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
2018-01-10SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2018-01-10SenatePresented and ordered printed 18104480D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback