VA SB790 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0216)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0216)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Professional and Occupational Regulation; boxing, martial arts, and professional wrestling events and participants. Provides for the regulation of amateur boxing and martial arts and professional wrestling by the Director of the Department of Professional and Occupational Regulation. The bill authorizes the Director to approve a sanctioning organization to oversee the conduct of amateur boxing and martial arts events. The bill sets out the requirements to be met by the sanctioning organization, including blood testing of the participants. The bill exempts amateur bouts and amateur boxing or martial arts engagements conducted by or held under the sponsorship of (i) any elementary or secondary school or public or private institution of higher education located in the Commonwealth or (ii) the Department of Corrections involving inmates of any state correctional institution. The bill has a delayed effective date of October 1, 2015, and requires the Director to convene a work group of interested parties affected by the provisions of the bill to determine an appropriate method for holding professional-amateur events.
Title
DPOR; promoters of boxing, martial arts, and wrestling events.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0216) | |
2015-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 216 (effective 10/1/15) | |
2015-02-23 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/23/15 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB790ER) |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Title replaced 15104989D-H1 |
2015-02-16 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-12 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-12 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB790H1 |
2015-02-12 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15104989D-H1 |
2015-02-12 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-11 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-10 | House | Committee substitute printed 15104989D-H1 |
2015-02-10 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2015-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB790S1 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15104097D-S1 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15104097D-S1 |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100577D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1455 (Same As) 2015-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0264)