VA SB787 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 539 (effective 7/1/20)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Hampton Roads Regional Arena Authority created; financing of a Hampton Roads arena and facility. Creates the Hampton Roads Regional Arena Authority and grants it certain powers relating to construction of an arena and facility. Among those powers is the authority to (i) issue bonds to construct the arena and facility, (ii) receive state sales and use tax revenue that is attributable to the arena and facility, (iii) use such revenue to repay such bonds, and (iv) distribute any excess revenue to any Hampton Roads locality that elects to contribute to the financing of the construction of an arena and facility. The bill provides that the Authority's entitlement to state sales and use tax revenue will expire on the earlier of the maturity date of any bonds it issues related to constructing the arena and facility or July 1, 2060. The powers granted by the bill to the Authority are similar to those granted to the City of Virginia Beach with respect to a sports or entertainment project.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hampton Roads Regional Arena Authority; created, financing of a Hampton Roads arena and facility.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: House substitute with amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (64-Y 34-N) (Y: 64 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendments (12-Y 1-N 2-A) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-31 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 539 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-06HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-05SenateSigned by President
2020-03-04SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB787ER)
2020-03-04SenateEnrolled
2020-02-26SenateTitle replaced 20108317D-H1
2020-02-26SenateHouse substitute with amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N)
2020-02-26HouseVOTE: Passage (64-Y 34-N)
2020-02-26HousePassed House with substitute with amendment (64-Y 34-N)
2020-02-26HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment SB787H1
2020-02-26HouseAmendment by Delegate Miyares agreed to
2020-02-26HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20108317D-H1
2020-02-26HouseRead third time
2020-02-25HouseRead second time
2020-02-21HouseCommittee substitute printed 20108317D-H1
2020-02-21HouseReported from Appropriations with substitute (18-Y 4-N)
2020-02-21HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-21HouseRead first time
2020-02-21HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-03SenateRead third time and passed Senate (37-Y 2-N)
2020-01-31SenatePrinted as engrossed 20103539D-E
2020-01-31SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB787E
2020-01-31SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2020-01-31SenateReading of amendments waived
2020-01-31SenateRead second time
2020-01-30SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2020-01-29SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
2020-01-20SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-01-20SenateReported from Local Government with amendments (12-Y 1-N 2-A)
2020-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Local Government
2020-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103539D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1525935(n/a)See Bill Text
1525942(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB787&201+sum+SB787
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB787+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB787E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB787H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB787ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S07V0027+SB0787
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S05V0085+SB0787
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0244SB0787+SB0787
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0275SB0787+SB0787
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0390+SB0787
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1488+SB0787
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1108SB0787+SB0787

Bill Comments

feedback