VA SB787 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Special license plates; TO BE MUTUALLY HELPFUL TO ONE ANOTHER. Authorizes the issuance of revenue-sharing special license plates for members and supporters of the Virginia State Police Association, Emergency Relief Fund, Inc., bearing the legend TO BE MUTUALLY HELPFUL TO ONE ANOTHER. The funds shall support the operations and programs of the Virginia State Police Association, Emergency Relief Fund, Inc., in providing financial relief to State Police officers and other public safety officials during times of need.
Title
License plates, special; issuance of those bearing legend TO BE MUTUALLY HELPFUL TO ONE ANOTHER.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-24 | House | Left in Transportation |
2015-02-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-06 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2015-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (12-Y 0-N) |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100544D |