VA SB784 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-03-03 - House: Left in General Laws
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-03-03 - House: Left in General Laws
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; operation of government stores. Authorizes the ABC Board to sell in government stores magazines or other publications whose principal purpose is to feature and educate the consuming public about the Virginia wine industry.
Title
ABC Board; sell magazines in government stores that educate public about Virginia wine industry.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-03 | House: Left in General Laws | |
2008-02-13 | House: Assigned GL sub: ABC/Gaming | |
2008-02-11 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2008-02-11 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-11 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-01-30 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-01-30 | Senate: Passed Senate (31-Y 9-N) | |
2008-01-30 | Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-30 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 10-N) | |
2008-01-29 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 089867220-E | |
2008-01-29 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB784E | |
2008-01-29 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2008-01-29 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2008-01-29 | Senate: Read second time | |
2008-01-28 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-25 | Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (14-Y 1-N) | |
2008-01-18 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services | |
2008-01-18 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 089867220 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB784 |