VA SB783 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-22 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-22 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Issuance of a restricted driver's license for multiple convictions of driving while intoxicated; completion of specialty dockets. Provides that a person whose driver's license has been revoked for multiple convictions of driving while intoxicated may file a petition for the issuance of a restricted driver's license without having to wait for the expiration of three years from the date of his last conviction when such person's last conviction resulted from a final order being entered by a court after the successful completion of a Veterans Treatment Court Program, behavioral health docket, or other specialty docket. Issuance of a restricted driver's license for multiple convictions of driving while intoxicated; completion of specialty dockets. Provides that a person whose driver's license has been revoked for multiple convictions of driving while intoxicated may file a petition for the issuance of a restricted driver's license without having to wait for the expiration of three years from the date of his last conviction when such person's last conviction resulted from a final order being entered by a court after the successful completion of a Veterans Treatment Court Program, behavioral health docket, or other specialty docket.
Title
Restricted driver's license; issuance for multiple convictions of driving while intoxicated, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-22 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2023-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) |
2023-02-16 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2023-02-09 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2023-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-16 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-10-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2022-10-06 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23100363D |