VA SB783 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 2 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Environmental Quality; carbon market participation. Authorizes the Department of Environmental Quality to participate in any carbon market for which submerged aquatic vegetation restoration qualifies as an activity that generates carbon offset credits and to enter into agreements necessary to effect such participation, including with private entities for assistance with registration and sale of offset credits. The bill requires any revenue resulting from the sale of such credits to be used to implement additional submerged aquatic vegetation monitoring, restoration, and research or to cover any administrative costs of participation in the credit market. The bill also requires the Department to hold exclusive title to credits until sold.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Carbon market participation; submerged aquatic vegetation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (74-Y 25-N) (Y: 74 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-03SenateSigned by President
2020-03-02HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-02SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB783ER)
2020-03-02SenateEnrolled
2020-02-25HouseVOTE: Passage (74-Y 25-N)
2020-02-25HousePassed House (74-Y 25-N)
2020-02-25HouseRead third time
2020-02-24HousePassed by for the day
2020-02-21HouseRead second time
2020-02-19HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (17-Y 5-N)
2020-02-17HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N)
2020-02-14HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake
2020-02-14HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2020-02-14HouseRead first time
2020-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB783S1
2020-02-11SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20107667D-S1
2020-02-11SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-11SenateRead second time
2020-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
2020-02-06SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
2020-02-04SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-02-04SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N)
2020-02-04SenateCommittee substitute printed 20107667D-S1
2020-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2020-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103471D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2821204.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB783&201+sum+SB783
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB783+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB783S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB783ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S01V0061+SB0783
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S05V0247+SB0783
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0457SB0783+SB0783
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0520SB0783+SB0783
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0521SB0783+SB0783
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0522SB0783+SB0783
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0523SB0783+SB0783
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0102V0039+SB0783
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H01V0237+SB0783
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1362+SB0783

Bill Comments

feedback