VA SB783 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0180)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0180)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Criminal Justice Services to review pretrial services agencies; report. Requires the Department of Criminal Justice Services (Department) to annually review each pretrial services agency to determine compliance with its biennial plan and operating standards. Current law requires the Department to review each pretrial services agency periodically. The bill also requires the Department to report annually to the Governor and the General Assembly on the performance of each pretrial services agency. This bill is a recommendation of the Virginia State Crime Commission. This bill is identical to HB 996.
Title
Pretrial services agencies; Department of Criminal Justice Services to review, report.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Peake [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0180) | |
2018-03-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 180 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 5, 2018 | |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 26, 2018 |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB783ER) |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-02-19 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-19 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-19 | House | Read third time |
2018-02-16 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-14 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103934D |