VA SB781 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0416)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0416)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Passing with a double yellow line. Allows drivers to cross double yellow lines or a solid yellow line immediately adjacent to a broken yellow line in order to pass a pedestrian or a device moved by human power, if such movement can be made safely. The bill also relocates a definition from the end of the section to the beginning for clarity. This bill incorporated
Title
Passing with a double yellow line; drivers allowed to pass a pedestrian, bicycle, skateboard, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 9-N) (Y: 88 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 9-N) (Y: 88 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0416) | |
2015-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 416 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/4/15 |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB781ER) |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Title replaced 15104611D-H1 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-20 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 9-N) |
2015-02-20 | House | Passed House with substitute (87-Y 9-N) |
2015-02-20 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB781H1 |
2015-02-20 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15104611D-H1 |
2015-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-20 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2015-02-19 | House | Passed by for the day |
2015-02-18 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-17 | House | Incorporates SB1228 |
2015-02-17 | House | Incorporates SB1027 |
2015-02-17 | House | Committee substitute printed 15104611D-H1 |
2015-02-17 | House | Reported from Transportation with substitute (21-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-06 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2015-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-30 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 1-N) |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB781S1 |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15104053D-S1 |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Incorporates SB1228 |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Incorporates SB1027 |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15104053D-S1 |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 2-N) |
2014-12-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2014-12-30 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101281D |