VA SB776 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0809)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0809)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Wetlands protection; living shorelines. Requires the Virginia Marine Resources Commission to promulgate and periodically update minimum standards for the protection and conservation of wetlands and to approve only living shoreline approaches to shoreline stabilization unless the best available science shows that such approaches are not suitable.
Title
Wetlands protection; living shorelines.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (32-Y 8-N) (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (70-Y 30-N) (Y: 70 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 7-N) (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (70-Y 30-N) (Y: 70 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 7-N) (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0809) | |
2020-04-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 809 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB776ER) |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-03-03 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (32-Y 8-N) |
2020-03-02 | House | VOTE: Passage (70-Y 30-N) |
2020-03-02 | House | Passed House with amendments (70-Y 30-N) |
2020-03-02 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2020-03-02 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-03-02 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-28 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-26 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (16-Y 6-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 2-N) |
2020-02-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2020-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 7-N) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 20102955D-E |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB776E |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102955D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 2 | 104.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
28 | 2 | 1301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
28 | 2 | 1302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
28 | 2 | 1308 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |