VA SB775 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0594)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0594)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public schools; military children; tuition. Prohibits the child of a person on active military duty who is attending school for free from being charged tuition upon such child's relocation pursuant to orders his parent received to relocate to a new duty station or to be deployed. The bill allows the child to remain enrolled in the current school division free of tuition through the end of the school year. The bill also prohibits the child of a person on active military duty who is eligible to attend a school for free from being charged tuition by a school division that will be that child's school division of residence upon such child's service member parent's relocation to the jurisdiction for that school division pursuant to orders received.
Title
Public schools; military children, tuition.
Sponsors
Sen. Mamie Locke [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0594) | |
2018-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 594 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 20, 2018 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-09 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB775ER) |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-07 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-07 | House | Passed House (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-07 | House | Read third time |
2018-03-06 | House | Read second time |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-23 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2018-02-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-02-21 | House | Reported from Education (21-Y 1-N) |
2018-02-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-02-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-16 | House | Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2018-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-29 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 18101502D-E |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB775E |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101502D |