VA SB774 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-23 - Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Big game hunting; guaranteed kills prohibited; penalty. Prohibits offering for sale, selling, offering to purchase, purchasing, or guaranteeing a kill of, or charging a fee for killing, a deer, bear, or wild turkey. Such prohibition does not apply to killing small game or migratory birds. The bill does not prevent a landowner from leasing land for hunting, except that a lease of land for hunting deer, bear, or wild turkey shall not be for a duration of less than three days. A violation is punishable as a Class 1 misdemeanor; when the aggregate of such sales or purchases, or any combination thereof, by any person totals $500 or more during any 90-day period, such violation is punishable as a Class 6 felony.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Big game hunting; guaranteed kills prohibited, penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-23SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-01-22SenateEngrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB774S1
2020-01-22SenateSubstitute by Senator Chafin agreed to 20106173D-S1
2020-01-22SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-01-22SenateCommittee amendment rejected
2020-01-22SenateRead second time
2020-01-22SenateFloor substitute printed 20106173D-S1 (Chafin)
2020-01-21SenatePassed by for the day
2020-01-20SenatePassed by for the day
2020-01-17SenatePassed by for the day
2020-01-16SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-01-14SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
2020-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2020-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104094D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
291521(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback