VA SB768 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 18 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

DBHDS; work group to study expanding the individuals who may conduct evaluations for temporary detention; report. Directs the Commissioner of the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services to establish a work group to (i) review the current process for conducting evaluations of persons who are subject to emergency custody orders to determine whether they meet the criteria for temporary detention, including any challenges or barriers to timely completion of such evaluations and factors giving rise to delays in completion of such evaluations, and (ii) develop a comprehensive plan to expand the individuals who may conduct effective evaluations of persons who are subject to emergency custody orders to determine whether they meet the criteria for temporary detention. The work group shall report its findings and conclusions and the comprehensive plan to the Governor and the Chairmen of the House Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions, Senate Committee on Education and Health, and Joint Subcommittee to Study Mental Health Services in the Commonwealth in the 21st Century by December 1, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Temporary detention; DBHDS shall study who may evaluate.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-20SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020
2020-03-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-18SenateSigned by President
2020-03-18SenateEnrolled
2020-03-18SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB768ER)
2020-03-07SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-03-05HouseVOTE: Adoption (98-Y 1-N)
2020-03-05HouseConference report agreed to by House (98-Y 1-N)
2020-03-05 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2020-03-03HouseDelegates: Aird, Hope, Austin
2020-03-03HouseConferees appointed by House
2020-03-02SenateSenators: Barker, Deeds, Hanger
2020-03-02SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2020-03-02SenateSenate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-27HouseHouse requested conference committee
2020-02-27HouseHouse insisted on substitute
2020-02-26SenateHouse substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N)
2020-02-24HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
2020-02-24HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2020-02-24HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB768H1
2020-02-24HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20108575D-H1
2020-02-24HouseRead third time
2020-02-21HouseRead second time
2020-02-19HouseCommittee substitute printed 20108575D-H1
2020-02-19HouseReported from Rules with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on Rules
2020-02-13HouseRead first time
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-05SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-04SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB768S1
2020-02-04SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20107346D-S1
2020-02-04SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-04SenateRead second time
2020-02-03SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-01-31SenateCommittee substitute printed 20107346D-S1
2020-01-31SenateReported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2020-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2020-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103578D

Same As/Similar To

HB1699 (Same As) 2020-03-12 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB768&201+sum+SB768
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB768+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB768S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB768H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB768ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S10V0036+SB0768
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0288SB0768+SB0768
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0337SB0768+SB0768
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H20V0154+SB0768
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1314+SB0768
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1014SB0768+SB0768
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1368SB0768+SB0768
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1955+SB0768
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1778SB0768+SB0768

Bill Comments

feedback