VA SB766 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0716)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0716)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health care services; explanation of benefits. Authorizes the State Corporation Commission to adopt regulations that establish alternative methods of delivery of the explanation of benefits, provided that such alternative method is in compliance with the provisions of federal regulations regarding the right to request privacy protection for protected health information.
Title
Health care; explanation of benefits, sensitive health care services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0716) | |
2020-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 716 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB766ER) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-28 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-28 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-28 | House | Committee substitute rejected 20109098D-H1 |
2020-02-28 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-27 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-25 | House | Committee substitute printed 20109098D-H1 |
2020-02-25 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2020-02-18 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB766S1 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20108039D-S1 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-09 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20108039D-S1 |
2020-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104452D |
Same As/Similar To
HB807 (Same As) 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0715)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 1 | 330.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3407.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |