VA SB765 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0538)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0538)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Commissioner of Highways; powers; emergency removal of snow and ice. Provides that the Commissioner of Highways has the authority to establish and use procedures as he deems necessary to ensure safe travel during an emergency or weather-related event and that procuring equipment and labor to ensure resources are available to address an emergency or weather-related event is an emergency pursuant to the Virginia Public Procurement Act.
Title
Highways, Commissioner of; powers, emergency removal of snow and ice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-29 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0538) | |
2016-03-29 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 538 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-07 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/7/2016 |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-01 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB765ER) |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-02-29 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-29 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-29 | House | Read third time |
2016-02-26 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-25 | House | Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-12 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2016-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-11 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 16101624D |