VA SB764 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0627)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0627)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public bodies; security of government databases and data communications. Requires every public body to report to the Virginia Fusion Intelligence Center all known incidents that threaten the security of the Commonwealth's data or communications or result in exposure of data protected by federal or state laws and all other incidents compromising the security of the public body's information technology systems with the potential to cause major disruption to normal activities of the public body or other public bodies. The bill requires such reports to be made to the Virginia Fusion Intelligence Center within 24 hours of the discovery of the incident and that the Virginia Fusion Intelligence Center share such reports with the Chief Information Officer promptly upon receipt. The bill requires the Chief Information Officer to convene a work group to review current cybersecurity reporting and information sharing practices and report any legislative recommendations to the Governor and the Chairmen of the Senate Committee on General Laws and Technology and the House Committee on Communications, Technology and Innovation by November 15, 2022.
Title
Public bodies; security of government databases and data communications, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (93-Y 5-N) (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Reported from Communications, Technology and Innovation with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (93-Y 5-N) (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Reported from Communications, Technology and Innovation with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0627) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 627 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB764ER) |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-09 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-08 | House | VOTE: Passage (93-Y 5-N) |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed House with amendment (93-Y 5-N) |
2022-03-08 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2022-03-08 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2022-03-08 | House | Read third time |
2022-03-07 | House | Read second time |
2022-03-03 | House | Reported from Communications, Technology and Innovation with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Communications, Technology and Innovation |
2022-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 22104425D-E |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB764E |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (13-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 22104425D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1290 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0626)
HB1290 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0626)
HB1290 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0626)
Subjects
Administration of Government
Computer Services and Uses
Databases
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Computer Services and Uses
Databases
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 2009 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 5514 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 603 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |