VA SB761 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0981)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0981)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Motor Vehicles; driver's license eligibility. Authorizes the Department of Motor Vehicles to issue a limited-duration driver's license, permit, or special identification card to an applicant with a valid, unexpired Employment Authorization Document.
Title
Driver's license; DMV to issue licenses and special ID cards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage #2 (60-Y 38-N) (Y: 60 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (63-Y 36-N) (Y: 63 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 4-N) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 2-N) (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (63-Y 36-N) (Y: 63 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 4-N) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 2-N) (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0981) | |
2020-04-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 981 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB761ER) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-26 | House | VOTE: Passage #2 (60-Y 38-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Passed House (60-Y 38-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House |
2020-02-26 | House | VOTE: Passage (63-Y 36-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Passed House (63-Y 36-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-25 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-21 | House | Reported from Appropriations (16-Y 6-N) |
2020-02-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-20 | House | Reported from Transportation (16-Y 6-N) |
2020-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 4-N) |
2020-02-18 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Transportation Innovations and General Topics |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-02-18 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB761S1 |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20107215D-S1 |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20107215D-S1 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with substitute (8-Y 7-N) |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103308D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 323 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 328.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 330 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 345 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 345.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |