VA SB760 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-21 - Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Licensure of psychologists; Psychology Interjurisdictional Compact. Authorizes Virginia to become a signatory to the Psychology Interjurisdictional Compact. The Compact permits eligible licensed psychologists to practice in Compact member states, provided that they are licensed in at least one member state. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2021, and directs the Board of Psychology to adopt emergency regulations to implement the provisions of the bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Psychologists; licensure, permitted to practice in Psychology Interjurisdictional Compact.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-21HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
2020-02-13HouseAssigned HWI sub: Health Professions
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2020-02-13HouseRead first time
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-10SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-10SenateRead second time and engrossed
2020-02-07SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2020-02-06SenateReported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2020-01-27SenateAssigned Education sub: Health Professions
2020-01-21SenateRereferred to Education and Health
2020-01-21SenateRereferred from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N)
2020-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2020-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103631D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5413606.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback