VA SB76 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 28 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-08 - Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (9-Y 5-N 1-A)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 28 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-08 - Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (9-Y 5-N 1-A)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Child day centers operated by religious institutions; exemption from licensure by Superintendent of Public Instruction. Exempts fully from the statutory requirement to be licensed by the Superintendent of Public Instruction any child day center that is operated or conducted under the auspices of a religious institution that (i) has tax exempt status as a nonprofit religious institution in accordance with § 501(c) of the Internal Revenue Code of 1954, as amended, or (ii) owns and exclusively occupies real property that is exempt from local taxation. Under current law, such child day centers are exempt from licensure but are still subject to several enumerated requirements. The bill, however, preserves the requirement for such child day centers to conduct background checks for employees and volunteers and prohibits the employment or service at such child day centers of any such individual who has been convicted of any barrier crime as defined in relevant law or who is the subject of a founded complaint of child abuse or neglect.
Title
Child day centers operated by religious institutions; exemption from licensure.
Sponsors
Sen. Tara Durant [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (9-Y 5-N 1-A) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-08 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (9-Y 5-N 1-A) |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Assigned Education and Health Sub: Public Education |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Rereferred to Education and Health |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Rereferred from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) |
2023-12-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2023-12-28 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24103207D |
Same As/Similar To
HB222 (Similar To) 2024-02-13 - Left in Education
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 741 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 914 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 289.030 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 289.031 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 289.035 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 289.039 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 289.04 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 289.049 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 289.057 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 289.058 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |