VA SB76 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0518)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Teacher licensure; approval of teacher education programs. Specifies that for the purpose of Board of Education regulations for the approval of teacher education programs, the term "education preparation program" includes four-year bachelor's degree programs in teacher education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Teacher licensure; education preparation programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Amendments by Senator reconsidered (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-29 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0518)
2018-03-29 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 518 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-03-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-20SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 20, 2018
2018-03-10SenateSigned by President
2018-03-09HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-09SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB76ER)
2018-03-09SenateEnrolled
2018-03-07HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2018-03-07HousePassed House (98-Y 0-N)
2018-03-07HouseSubstitute by Delegate Landes withdrawn 18107953D-H1
2018-03-07HouseRead third time
2018-03-06HousePassed by for the day
2018-03-05HousePassed by for the day
2018-03-02HouseFloor substitute printed 18107953D-H1 (Landes)
2018-03-02HouseRead second time
2018-02-28HouseReported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
2018-02-26HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2018-02-16HouseAssigned Education sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-01-23HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2018-01-23HouseRead first time
2018-01-23HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-01-17SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-01-16SenatePassed by for the day
2018-01-16SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-01-16SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-01-15SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB76S1
2018-01-15SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 18104868D-S1
2018-01-15SenateReading of substitute waived
2018-01-15SenateRead second time
2018-01-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2018-01-11SenateCommittee substitute printed 18104868D-S1
2018-01-11SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2017-12-04SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2017-12-04SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100771D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221298.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+SB76
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB76+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB76S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB76H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB76ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0518+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S04V0001+SB0076
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0015SB0076+SB0076
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0038SB0076+SB0076
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0040SB0076+SB0076
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0044SB0076+SB0076
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H0901V0058+SB0076
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H09V0164+SB0076
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1431+SB0076

Bill Comments

feedback