VA SB758 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-27 - Incorporated by Privileges and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-27 - Incorporated by Privileges and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; absentee voting by persons age 65 or older. Entitles persons age 65 or older on the day of an election for which an absentee ballot is requested to vote absentee.
Title
Elections; absentee voting by persons age 65 or older.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Incorporated by Privileges and Elections (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-27 | Senate | Incorporated by Privileges and Elections |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Assigned to P&E sub: Elections |
2014-12-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2014-12-22 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101639D |
Same As/Similar To
SB719 (Similar To) 2015-02-24 - Left in Privileges and Elections