VA SB754 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0308)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0308)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Motor vehicle insurance; underinsured motor vehicle. Requires any motor vehicle liability insurance policy issued, delivered, or renewed in the Commonwealth after July 1, 2023, to include a specific statement regarding the insurer requirements to provide underinsured motorist coverage that pays any damages due to an insured in addition to any bodily injury or property damage liability that is applicable to the insured's damages. The bill requires that the endorsement or provisions of a motor vehicle liability policy to provide uninsured motorist insurance coverage also provide underinsured motorist insurance coverage with limits that are equal to the uninsured motorist insurance coverage limits. Under the bill, underinsured motorist coverage shall be paid without any credit for the bodily injury and property damage coverage available for payment, unless any named insured elects to reduce any underinsured motorist coverage payments by notifying the insurer. If an injured person is entitled to underinsured motorist coverage under one or more policies wherein a named insured has elected to reduce the underinsured motorist limits by the available bodily injury liability insurance or property damage liability insurance coverage available for payment, any amount available for payment shall be credited against such policies in payment priority established in current law, and where there is more than one such policy entitled to such credit, the credit shall be apportioned pro-rata pursuant to the policies' respective available underinsured motorist coverages. The bill also provides that taxicab operators may fulfill their insurance filing requirement by showing evidence of a certificate of self-insurance. The bill requires, with regard to the self-insurance protection of a taxicab operator, the amount of bodily injury or property damage liability coverage available for payment from any source to be credited against and reduce the amount of protection otherwise available against an underinsured motorist. Motor vehicle insurance; underinsured motor vehicle. Requires any motor vehicle liability insurance policy issued, delivered, or renewed in the Commonwealth after July 1, 2023, to include a specific statement regarding the insurer requirements to provide underinsured motorist coverage that pays any damages due to an insured in addition to any bodily injury or property damage liability that is applicable to the insured's damages. The bill requires that the endorsement or provisions of a motor vehicle liability policy to provide uninsured motorist insurance coverage also provide underinsured motorist insurance coverage with limits that are equal to the uninsured motorist insurance coverage limits. Under the bill, underinsured motorist coverage shall be paid without any credit for the bodily injury and property damage coverage available for payment, unless any named insured elects to reduce any underinsured motorist coverage payments by notifying the insurer. If an injured person is entitled to underinsured motorist coverage under one or more policies wherein a named insured has elected to reduce the underinsured motorist limits by the available bodily injury liability insurance or property damage liability insurance coverage available for payment, any amount available for payment shall be credited against such policies in payment priority established in current law, and where there is more than one such policy entitled to such credit, the credit shall be apportioned pro-rata pursuant to the policies' respective available underinsured motorist coverages. The bill also provides that taxicab operators may fulfill their insurance filing requirement by showing evidence of a certificate of self-insurance. The bill requires, with regard to the self-insurance protection of a taxicab operator, the amount of bodily injury or property damage liability coverage available for payment from any source to be credited against and reduce the amount of protection otherwise available against an underinsured motorist.
Title
Motor vehicle insurance; uninsured motor vehicle.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (83-Y 15-N 1-A) (Y: 83 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0308) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 308 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB754ER) |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-09 | House | VOTE: Passage (83-Y 15-N 1-A) |
2022-03-09 | House | Passed House (83-Y 15-N 1-A) |
2022-03-09 | House | Read third time |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed by for the day |
2022-03-07 | House | Read second time |
2022-03-03 | House | Reported from Commerce and Energy (14-Y 8-N) |
2022-02-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Energy |
2022-02-23 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB754S1 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22105623D-S1 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22105623D-S1 |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 22104918D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 2 | 2202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 2206 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2057 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |