VA SB752 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 19 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-06 - Incorporated by Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 19 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-06 - Incorporated by Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
State and Local Government Conflict of Interests Act; prohibited conduct for Governor's Secretaries. Clarifies that for purposes of prohibiting certain conduct of a Governor's Secretary in the year following termination of public service, the definition of "agency" includes all agencies assigned to the Secretary by law or by executive order.
Title
State and Local Government Conflict of Interests Act;prohibited conduct for Governor's Secretaries.
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] | Sen. John Watkins [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Incorporated by Rules (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-06 | Senate | Incorporated by Rules |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Assigned Rules sub: Ethics and Conflict of Interest |
2014-12-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-12-19 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101905D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1424 (Similar To) 2015-04-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0777)